+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 110
- Action: Signed
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate first read
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 18, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 6:21 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 26, 2012: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
March 20, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 27, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
February 23, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
January 17, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 17, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1