+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Allen flr amend (ref Bill) (sub RAE)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rural Affairs and Environment: Do pass amended
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rural Affairs and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: AWL
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to AWL- Barton
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass amended
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture, Water and Lands
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Rural Affairs and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rural Affairs and Environment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Agriculture, Water and Lands
House Proposed Amendment
Allen flr amend (ref Bill) (sub RAE) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to AWL- Barton - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Agriculture, Water and Lands
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 31, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 24
March 30, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2015: Rural Affairs and Environment: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
March 10, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 24
January 27, 2015: Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
January 27, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1