+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: HED
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Higher Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Higher Education - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Higher Education - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Higher Education - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Higher Education - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 15, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2007: Higher Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 22, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1