+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:08PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:55AM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Ways & Means Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways & Means Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (5)
March 16, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
March 2, 2021: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 23, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
January 26, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 26, 2021: House Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor