+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate first read
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 15, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: JUD
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
2316jud
Senate Fact Sheet
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 16, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
June 15, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 9
January 22, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8