+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: ED (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Shooter flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass amended
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Shooter flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Shooter flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-17 ed_aspassedcow
Senate Fact Sheet
3-27 ed_aspassedcommittee
Senate Fact Sheet
3-18 ed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 21, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 5
April 21, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 7
March 11, 2014: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
March 10, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 5
January 22, 2014: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor