+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 144
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PS (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Yee flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Safety: Do pass amended
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:54 pm
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
Yee flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Adopted Amendment
Yee flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-28 ps-jud
Senate Fact Sheet
4-14 ps-jud_aspassedcow
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
April 16, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
April 15, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2014: Public Safety: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
February 18, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 28, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 28, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2