+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Leach flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by MAPS - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to MAPS - Roberts - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
April 14, 2021: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
April 7, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
March 2, 2021: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 24, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
January 26, 2021: House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 6
January 26, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor