+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:05PM.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
January 17, 2017: House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor