+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- HEALTH - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: withdrawn.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 12
March 2, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2016: Health: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
January 21, 2016: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 5
January 21, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 21, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9