+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 281
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSMT (ref Bill)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Public Safety, Military and Technology - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 31, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 25
March 30, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
February 25, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 27, 2015: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor