+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- WM - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass amended.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 24, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
March 24, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2016: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
March 1, 2016: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 5
February 25, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
February 25, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 21, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 21, 2016: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 21, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 21, 2016: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 7