+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee: do pass amended.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Floor Amend to ED - Lieberman - passed
- Floor Amend to ED - Udall - passed
- ED - passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
March 20, 2019: Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee
- Yeas: 6
March 19, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 8
February 12, 2019: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
February 12, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor