+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 13, 2009 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 137
- Action: Signed
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 10, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to COM - Reagan
- Amendment: COM - passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Reagan Floor amendment, reference to the Commerce Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
2306ced
Senate Fact Sheet
Reagan Floor amendment, reference to the Commerce Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
June 26, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 6
June 11, 2009: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 3
June 10, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
February 24, 2009: Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
January 20, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor