+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Financial Institutions Committee: do pass.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Financial Institutions Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- INS - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Insurance Committee: do pass amended.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Insurance Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
March 28, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
March 28, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2016: Financial Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 18, 2016: Senate Financial Institutions Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 16, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
February 16, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
January 21, 2016: Insurance: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 21, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 21, 2016: House Insurance Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 21, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor