+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 16
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 11:55 amobject
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: NRPS
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to NRPS - Ulmer
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass amended
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Natural Resources and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Ulmer Substitute Floor amendment to the Natural Resources and Public Safety amendment to HB2306, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Ulmer Substitute Floor amendment to the Natural Resources and Public Safety amendment to HB2306, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
3-12 nrra
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 7, 2007: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 6, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
January 16, 2007: Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 16, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor