+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Senate first read
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Mesnard
- Amendment passed: FFR
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility
- House first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Mesnard Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility
House Proposed Amendment
Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility
House Adopted Amendment
Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility
House Proposed Amendment
Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility
House Adopted Amendment
Mesnard Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 17, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 17, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
March 6, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2014: Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor