+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 332 rfeir
- Action: Signed
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Y passed 32
- Rfeir action sections
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Y passed sec. 32
- Rfeir action sections
- Third read: Passed
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Nelson flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Gould flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate first read
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: JUD
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to JUD - Farnsworth
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Harper
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Campbell
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Heinz
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (21)
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gould flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Heinz Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Harper Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Farnsworth Floor Amendment; reference to the Judiciary Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Farnsworth Floor Amendment; reference to the Judiciary Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Campbell Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Heinz Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Harper Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Nelson flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2011: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
April 12, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
March 14, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
January 26, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 26, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9