+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 10, 2009 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 81
- Action: Signed
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 16, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Reagan
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 1:45 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Reagan Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Reagan Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
2301ced
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
June 26, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 7
June 16, 2009: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
June 16, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 9
January 22, 2009: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
January 22, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor