+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: held.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by APPROP - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee: withdrawn.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 25
February 14, 2018: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
January 17, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor