+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 26, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 148 e
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 2:35 pm
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Government Institutions: Do pass
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: BI
- Amendment withdrawn: MAPS
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Banking and Insurance: Do pass amended
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Insurance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Banking and Insurance
House Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
3-16 gov
Senate Fact Sheet
Banking and Insurance
House Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 8, 2010: Government Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
March 3, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 19, 2010: Banking and Insurance: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 19, 2010: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 19, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor