+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Yee flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Senate first read
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Yee flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 30, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 23
March 24, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
February 23, 2015: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 12, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 2
January 26, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
January 26, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor