+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 30, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 3:55 pmobject
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Commerce: Withdrawn
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Banking and Insurance: Do pass
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Insurance
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (2)
January 25, 2010: Banking and Insurance: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
January 25, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor