+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 29, 2009 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 25, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
January 20, 2009: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 20, 2009: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 20, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor