+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Final reading in Senate: FAILED
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- House adopted conference committee report.
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted conference committee report.
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- House caucus on conference committee report.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate caucus on conference committee report.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority report: That the House accept the Senate amendments and the bill be further amended.
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee recommendation: That the House accept the Senate amendments and the bill be further amended.
- House Minority report: That the House accept the Senate amendments and the bill be further amended.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate members appointed to conference committee: PACE, GOWAN, QUEZADA
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- House members appointed to conference committee: PAYNE, BLACKMAN, JERMAINE
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- TAT (ref Bill) adopted
- Pace flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Hernandez D - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:05PM.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
May 17, 2021: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 14
May 13, 2021: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
March 22, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
February 24, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 23, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 11
January 26, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 26, 2021: House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1