+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Public Safety, Military and Technology - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 23, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 6, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
February 12, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 27, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
January 27, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor