+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Lesko
- Third read: Failed
- Final disposition: Failed in House on third reading
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Education: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House second read
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Lesko Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Lesko Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 17, 2014: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 2
February 5, 2014: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 4, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor