+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education
- Higher Education: Do pass
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education K-12
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Boone
On March 19, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Education (K-12): Do pass
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education (K-12)
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Higher Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education K-12
Senate Proposed Amendment
Boone Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Higher Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Boone Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Education K-12
Senate Proposed Amendment
3-26 k12
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2007: Higher Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
March 21, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
January 18, 2007: Education (K-12): Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
January 18, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1