+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting House action on Senate amendments
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Klein flr amend (ref APPROP)
- Amendment adopted: Murphy #1 flr amend (ref APPROP)
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Finance: Withdrawn
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to TI - Dial
- Amendment passed: TI
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Technology and Infrastructure: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Technology and Infrastructure
- House first read
+ − Amendments (21)
Klein flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Dial Floor Amendment; reference to the Technology and Infrastructure Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Technology and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Technology and Infrastructure
House Proposed Amendment
Technology and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Technology and Infrastructure
House Proposed Amendment
Technology and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Murphy #1 flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
March 28, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
March 10, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 21
February 15, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 15, 2011: Technology and Infrastructure: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor