+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Fillmore - passed
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- House Government & Elections Committee: do pass.
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government & Elections Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2022: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 22, 2022: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
January 20, 2022: House Government & Elections Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
January 20, 2022: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor