+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 50
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:12 pm
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce amd Workforce Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Do pass
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (5)
March 17, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 17, 2015: Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 12, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 27, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 27, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor