+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 141
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:29 pmobject
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 16, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
April 15, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2014: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 22, 2014: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor