+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 13, 2009 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 168
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 23, 2009 in the House:
- HB 2288 substituted for SB 1023 on Third Reading.
On June 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Finance: Withdrawn
- Rules: Withdrawn
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Chad Campbell #1
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Chad Campbell #2
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
- House second read
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (4)
June 23, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
March 11, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 4
February 9, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
January 26, 2009: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor