+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 13, 2009 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 167
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 29, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On June 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Yarbrough
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:15 pmobject
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
- House second read
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Yarbrough Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
2287fin_caucus floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Yarbrough Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
7-22 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
7-22 fin_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
June 29, 2009: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 7
June 25, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
June 10, 2009: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
May 13, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 13
January 22, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 22, 2009: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor