+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:19PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Osborne - passed
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:21PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2020: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 17, 2020: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
January 23, 2020: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 13
January 23, 2020: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8