+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Engrossed Bill - Cook - failed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Cook to inc Cook flr amend - fail on RCV
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- Representative Cook motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), House Bill 2285 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v.
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Amended by TI - replaced by substitute
- Sub amended by APPROP - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to APPROP - Livingston - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Representative Cook to include the TI committee amendment (withdrawal APPROP committee amendment) Representative Salman 2nd RCV
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 19, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
March 13, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 10
March 13, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 10
March 13, 2023: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 6
March 7, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 22
January 18, 2023: House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
January 18, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 18, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor