+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 33
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: RHS
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Cardenas
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Reform and Human Services: Do pass amended
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Reform and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Reform and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
Reform and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Reform and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
Reform and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 9, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
March 5, 2014: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 5, 2014: Rules: Proper for consideration (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 4, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 4
January 28, 2014: Reform and Human Services: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 28, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor