+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Senate second read
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 11:00 am
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Votes (3)
March 11, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2008: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor