+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- COM (ref Bill) withdrawn
- APPROP #1 (ref Bill) withdrawn
- APPROP #2 (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by COM - withdrawn
- Amended by APPROP - Cobb - replaced by substitute
- SUB Floor Amend to APPROP - Lieberman - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (7)
June 29, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
March 4, 2021: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
March 4, 2021: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 3, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 2
January 26, 2021: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 13
January 26, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 26, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor