+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:02 pmobject
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (5)
April 15, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
March 3, 2014: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 27, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2014: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor