+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Udall - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:43PM.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 20, 2018: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 12, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
January 17, 2018: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 17, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor