+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass amended.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 17, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 17, 2018: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor