+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Failed
- Final disposition: Failed in House on final passage
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 10, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: RULES
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Chad Campbell #1
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Chad Campbell #2
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
6-24 strikermemo caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
July 1, 2009: House final read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 19
July 1, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 3
June 11, 2009: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4
June 10, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 3
January 20, 2009: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 20, 2009: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor