+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 139
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:23 pmobject
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: COM - Forese
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (5)
April 18, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
March 6, 2013: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 4, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2013: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor