+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: Passed
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Farnsworth flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Griffin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- SUB Floor Amend to WM to Bill - Shooter - passed
- Floor Amend to WM to Bill - Powers Hannley - withdrawn
- WM
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass amended.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
March 23, 2017: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 56
March 21, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 28, 2017: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 23, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 17, 2017: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor