+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: APPROP
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
6-19 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 18, 2009: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 5
June 17, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 7
January 20, 2009: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
January 20, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor