+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- FIN (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- Fann flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:07PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- House Ways & Means Committee: do pass.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- House Land & Agriculture Committee: do pass.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Ways & Means Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Land & Agriculture Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
May 27, 2019: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 26
May 27, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
February 27, 2019: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
February 25, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 28
January 28, 2019: House Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
January 28, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 28, 2019: House Land & Agriculture Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor