+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 27, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 288
- Action: Signed
On June 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment withdrawn: PSHS (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Bee flr amend (ref APPROP)
- Amendment failed: Gould flr amend (ref APPROP)
- Motion to amend 1
- Motion to amend 1
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole:
On June 26, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
On March 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended
On March 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate first read
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: JUD
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- Human Services: Do pass
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Human Services
- House first read
+ − Amendments (11)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Bee Floor Amendment; reference to APPROP amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-28 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
6-25 approp strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
3-26 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
6-26 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
June 26, 2008: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
June 26, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 4
March 18, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
February 28, 2008: Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 31, 2008: Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1