+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 20, 2009: Government: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 20, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor