+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 208
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSMT (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: MAPS
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Borrelli
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Borrelli - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 1, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 31, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
March 3, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 22, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 22, 2015: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor